Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 3010.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 159.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 144.) (February 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|