California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 21, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill February 13, 2013
Bill February 6, 2013
Bill January 29, 2013