LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB54
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB54
Compare Versions
SB54 Chaptered October 13, 2013
SB54 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB54 Amended September 3, 2013
SB54 Amended August 21, 2013
SB54 Amended August 5, 2013
SB54 Amended February 13, 2013
SB54 Amended February 6, 2013
SB54 Amended January 29, 2013
SB54 Introduced December 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB54 Chaptered October 13, 2013
SB54 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB54 Amended September 3, 2013
SB54 Amended August 21, 2013
SB54 Amended August 5, 2013
SB54 Amended February 13, 2013
SB54 Amended February 6, 2013
SB54 Amended January 29, 2013
SB54 Introduced December 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare