|
06/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5547.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2599.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2013
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|