California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2014

Amended

Bill January 22, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 1, 2013