LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB545
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB545
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB545
Compare Versions
SB545 Chaptered June 25, 2014
SB545 Enrolled June 18, 2014
SB545 Amended January 22, 2014
SB545 Amended January 6, 2014
SB545 Amended April 1, 2013
SB545 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB545 Chaptered June 25, 2014
SB545 Enrolled June 18, 2014
SB545 Amended January 22, 2014
SB545 Amended January 6, 2014
SB545 Amended April 1, 2013
SB545 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare