|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 832, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4969.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Set for hearing August 28. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 6427.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5914.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2863.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2699.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1147.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 852.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8 in L. & I.R. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|