California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 7, 2014
Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 26, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 29, 2013
Bill May 9, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013