LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB556
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB556
Compare Versions
SB556 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB556 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB556 Amended August 21, 2014
SB556 Amended August 7, 2014
SB556 Amended September 4, 2013
SB556 Amended August 26, 2013
SB556 Amended July 1, 2013
SB556 Amended June 19, 2013
SB556 Amended May 29, 2013
SB556 Amended May 9, 2013
SB556 Amended April 9, 2013
SB556 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB556 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB556 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB556 Amended August 21, 2014
SB556 Amended August 7, 2014
SB556 Amended September 4, 2013
SB556 Amended August 26, 2013
SB556 Amended July 1, 2013
SB556 Amended June 19, 2013
SB556 Amended May 29, 2013
SB556 Amended May 9, 2013
SB556 Amended April 9, 2013
SB556 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare