|
09/23/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 663.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|