California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill August 15, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill June 10, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013