LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB568
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB568
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB568
Compare Versions
SB568 Chaptered September 23, 2013
SB568 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB568 Amended August 15, 2013
SB568 Amended August 5, 2013
SB568 Amended June 20, 2013
SB568 Amended June 18, 2013
SB568 Amended June 10, 2013
SB568 Amended April 1, 2013
SB568 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB568 Chaptered September 23, 2013
SB568 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB568 Amended August 15, 2013
SB568 Amended August 5, 2013
SB568 Amended June 20, 2013
SB568 Amended June 18, 2013
SB568 Amended June 10, 2013
SB568 Amended April 1, 2013
SB568 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare