|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 431, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4871.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6405.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected July 11.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 661.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|