California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 20, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 15, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013