LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB577
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB577
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB577
Compare Versions
SB577 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB577 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB577 Amended August 21, 2014
SB577 Amended August 11, 2014
SB577 Amended June 25, 2014
SB577 Amended May 20, 2014
SB577 Amended January 6, 2014
SB577 Amended April 15, 2013
SB577 Amended April 9, 2013
SB577 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB577 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB577 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB577 Amended August 21, 2014
SB577 Amended August 11, 2014
SB577 Amended June 25, 2014
SB577 Amended May 20, 2014
SB577 Amended January 6, 2014
SB577 Amended April 15, 2013
SB577 Amended April 9, 2013
SB577 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare