|
09/09/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4492.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4485.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Set for hearing August 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4397.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5915.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 810.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 638.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|