California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2014

Amended

Bill June 23, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill May 14, 2014
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013