LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB578
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB578
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB578
Compare Versions
SB578 Chaptered September 9, 2014
SB578 Enrolled August 15, 2014
SB578 Amended June 23, 2014
SB578 Amended June 9, 2014
SB578 Amended May 14, 2014
SB578 Amended April 25, 2013
SB578 Amended April 1, 2013
SB578 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB578 Chaptered September 9, 2014
SB578 Enrolled August 15, 2014
SB578 Amended June 23, 2014
SB578 Amended June 9, 2014
SB578 Amended May 14, 2014
SB578 Amended April 25, 2013
SB578 Amended April 1, 2013
SB578 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare