Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2013
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2341.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|