LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB579
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB579
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB579
Compare Versions
SB579 Amended June 11, 2014
SB579 Amended January 27, 2014
SB579 Amended January 15, 2014
SB579 Amended January 6, 2014
SB579 Amended September 11, 2013
SB579 Amended April 9, 2013
SB579 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB579 Amended June 11, 2014
SB579 Amended January 27, 2014
SB579 Amended January 15, 2014
SB579 Amended January 6, 2014
SB579 Amended September 11, 2013
SB579 Amended April 9, 2013
SB579 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare