California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill June 11, 2014
Bill January 27, 2014
Bill January 15, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill September 11, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013