|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1972.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 606.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 445.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 221.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Set for hearing February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|