LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB59
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB59
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB59
Compare Versions
SB59 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB59 Enrolled August 27, 2013
SB59 Amended July 3, 2013
SB59 Amended June 12, 2013
SB59 Amended April 16, 2013
SB59 Amended February 14, 2013
SB59 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB59 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB59 Enrolled August 27, 2013
SB59 Amended July 3, 2013
SB59 Amended June 12, 2013
SB59 Amended April 16, 2013
SB59 Amended February 14, 2013
SB59 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare