California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill July 3, 2013
Bill June 12, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill February 14, 2013