|
10/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2408.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Set for hearing September 11. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2390.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2276.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3029.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on JUD.) suspended. (Page 2513.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 787.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|