California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 21, 2013
Bill August 7, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013