LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB594
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB594
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB594
Compare Versions
SB594 Chaptered October 12, 2013
SB594 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB594 Amended September 4, 2013
SB594 Amended August 21, 2013
SB594 Amended August 7, 2013
SB594 Amended May 24, 2013
SB594 Amended April 18, 2013
SB594 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB594 Chaptered October 12, 2013
SB594 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB594 Amended September 4, 2013
SB594 Amended August 21, 2013
SB594 Amended August 7, 2013
SB594 Amended May 24, 2013
SB594 Amended April 18, 2013
SB594 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare