07/03/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/03/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2131.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 492.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 389.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |