LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB6
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB6
Compare Versions
SB6 Chaptered July 3, 2013
SB6 Enrolled June 25, 2013
SB6 Amended April 8, 2013
SB6 Amended January 15, 2013
SB6 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB6 Chaptered July 3, 2013
SB6 Enrolled June 25, 2013
SB6 Amended April 8, 2013
SB6 Amended January 15, 2013
SB6 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare