California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB6 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill June 25, 2013

Chaptered

Bill July 3, 2013

Amended

Bill April 8, 2013
Bill January 15, 2013