|
07/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2151.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 579.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|