LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB602
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB602
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB602
Compare Versions
SB602 Chaptered July 3, 2013
SB602 Enrolled June 26, 2013
SB602 Amended April 11, 2013
SB602 Amended April 1, 2013
SB602 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB602 Chaptered July 3, 2013
SB602 Enrolled June 26, 2013
SB602 Amended April 11, 2013
SB602 Amended April 1, 2013
SB602 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare