California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2013

Chaptered

Bill July 3, 2013

Amended

Bill April 11, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013