|
09/24/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 348, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|