California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2013

Amended

Bill August 19, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013