LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB606
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB606
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB606
Compare Versions
SB606 Chaptered September 24, 2013
SB606 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB606 Amended August 19, 2013
SB606 Amended August 6, 2013
SB606 Amended August 5, 2013
SB606 Amended June 20, 2013
SB606 Amended May 7, 2013
SB606 Amended April 9, 2013
SB606 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB606 Chaptered September 24, 2013
SB606 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB606 Amended August 19, 2013
SB606 Amended August 6, 2013
SB606 Amended August 5, 2013
SB606 Amended June 20, 2013
SB606 Amended May 7, 2013
SB606 Amended April 9, 2013
SB606 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare