|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2136.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2702.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 807.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 759.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|