California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill August 26, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013