LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB613
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB613
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB613
Compare Versions
SB613 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB613 Enrolled September 6, 2013
SB613 Amended August 26, 2013
SB613 Amended April 23, 2013
SB613 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB613 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB613 Enrolled September 6, 2013
SB613 Amended August 26, 2013
SB613 Amended April 23, 2013
SB613 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare