Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6119.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 433.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 406.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|