LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB614
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB614
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB614
Compare Versions
SB614 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB614 Enrolled August 26, 2014
SB614 Amended August 18, 2014
SB614 Amended June 16, 2014
SB614 Amended June 9, 2014
SB614 Amended August 6, 2013
SB614 Amended June 4, 2013
SB614 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB614 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB614 Enrolled August 26, 2014
SB614 Amended August 18, 2014
SB614 Amended June 16, 2014
SB614 Amended June 9, 2014
SB614 Amended August 6, 2013
SB614 Amended June 4, 2013
SB614 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare