California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 4, 2013