|
08/29/2014
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Held at desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4544.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6016.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|