BILL NUMBER: SB 616ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 14, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 10, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 27, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Roth (Coauthor: Senator Fuller) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 21683.4 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to aviation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 616, Roth. Aeronautics Account: California Aid to Airports Program. Existing federal law authorizes airport sponsors to submit applications to the Secretary of Transportation for financial assistance for airport improvement projects. Under federal law, upon approval by the Secretary of Transportation, the United States government may pay for certain project costs. Existing law establishes the Aeronautics Account in the State Transportation Fund, and continuously appropriates the moneys in the account for expenditure by the Division of Aeronautics within the Department of Transportation and the California Transportation Commission. Existing law requires that funds in the account be paid to certain public entities owning and operating airports for projects for airport and aviation purposes, as defined, or operation and maintenance purposes, as defined. Existing law authorizes any balance remaining in the account to be used as a portion of the local match for federal Airport Improvement Program grants for certain airports. Existing law prohibits the California Transportation Commission from allocating funds until the federal grant offer is accepted by the public entity and authorizes the division, upon allocation of the funds by the commission, to pay a public entity 5% of the amount of a federal Airport Improvement Program grant. This bill would require the department to certify that, at the time a grant is issued, the department has all statements, resolutions, and other documentation required for fulfillment of grant terms and conditions. This bill would allow the recipient of the grant to begin the project for which the grant was awarded upon receipt of this certification. If, after transmitting this certification, the department determines additional documentation is required, this bill would allow the recipient of the grant 45 days to submit additional required documentation. The bill would prevent the applicant from losing eligibility for the grant due to the need for additional documentation during this 45-day period. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 21683.4 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 21683.4. In administering financial assistance programs pursuant to Sections 21602, 21682, 21683, and 21683.1, the department shall certify to an applicant that at the time a grant award is issued, statements, resolutions, and other documentation required by the department for fulfillment of grant terms and conditions have been received by the department. Upon receipt of certification from the department, the applicant may begin the project for which funds have been awarded. After the department has transmitted certification to the applicant, if the department requires further documentation to satisfy grant terms and conditions, the applicant shall have 45 days to submit the required documentation, during which time the applicant shall not lose eligibility for the grant award due to the department' s need for further documentation.