California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Amended

Bill June 10, 2014
Bill January 27, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 1, 2013