|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 548, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4802.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6367.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2636.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2629.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|