LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB636
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB636
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB636
Compare Versions
SB636 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB636 Enrolled August 26, 2014
SB636 Amended June 15, 2014
SB636 Amended January 15, 2014
SB636 Amended January 6, 2014
SB636 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB636 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB636 Enrolled August 26, 2014
SB636 Amended June 15, 2014
SB636 Amended January 15, 2014
SB636 Amended January 6, 2014
SB636 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare