California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill June 15, 2014
Bill January 15, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014