|
09/20/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2977.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 2862.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2862.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Chesbro.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 32. Noes 30. Page 2850.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2794.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1088.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 642.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|