LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB665
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB665
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB665
Compare Versions
SB665 Chaptered September 20, 2013
SB665 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB665 Amended September 4, 2013
SB665 Amended August 30, 2013
SB665 Amended August 5, 2013
SB665 Amended June 24, 2013
SB665 Amended April 30, 2013
SB665 Amended April 16, 2013
SB665 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB665 Chaptered September 20, 2013
SB665 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB665 Amended September 4, 2013
SB665 Amended August 30, 2013
SB665 Amended August 5, 2013
SB665 Amended June 24, 2013
SB665 Amended April 30, 2013
SB665 Amended April 16, 2013
SB665 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare